Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Clear Creek Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Jason L. Bailey, against Skelton, Jack R., Skelton, Janet G., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 122nd District Court with Ellisor, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEllisor, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House122nd District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: March 12, 2021Notice of Non Suit Tax- Final - OCA
Date: January 12, 2022Tax Service Request
Date: March 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit-Final-CCISD Notice of Non Suit Tax- Final - OCA Notice of Non-Suit-Final Notice of Non Suit Tax- Final - OCA Notice of Non-Suit-Final |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation and Return | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product 2 citations issued @ $16.00. Sent to S/O 2 citations issued @ $16.00. Sent to S/O |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Service Tax Service Request 2 citations to be issued. Assigned to MM 2 citations to be issued. Assigned to MM |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition - Tax Original Petition |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition - Tax Original Petition Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.