Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Clear Creek Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Elizabeth A. Wiehle-Wang, against Warden, Travis, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeves, Kerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: March 12, 2021Original Answer
Date: February 10, 2022Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Date: January 06, 2022Order - Tax - Signed by Tax Master
Date: January 04, 2022Tax Proposed Order
Date: December 29, 2021Tax Motion
Date: December 29, 2021Citation by Posting and Return
Date: October 18, 2021Citation by Posting Issuance
Date: October 14, 2021Affidavit
Date: October 13, 2021Affidavit
Date: October 13, 2021Tax Service Request
Date: October 13, 2021Amended Petition
Date: October 13, 2021Citation Returned Unexecuted
Date: September 15, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: July 21, 2021Tax Service Request
Date: July 19, 2021Amended Petition
Date: July 19, 2021Citation Returned Unexecuted
Date: May 24, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: March 18, 2021Tax Service Request
Date: March 17, 2021Original Petition - Tax
Date: March 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) 12/05/2022 Reset by Court to 11/13/2023 | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Attorney ad Litem Original Answer Original Answer Attorney ad Litem Original Answer |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM (CHRISTOPHER ERVIN) SIGNED KLN/law (PER TAX MASTER'S RECOMMENDATION). ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM (CHRISTOPHER ERVIN) SIGNED KLN/law (PER TAX MASTER'S RECOMMENDATION). |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Tax - Signed by Tax Master Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judge's Notes on Hearings and Trials Tax Master's Recommendation: Appoint Christopher Ervin attorney ad litem, per order filed. TWM Tax Master's Recommendation: Appoint Christopher Ervin attorney ad litem, per order filed. TWM |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order To Appoint Attorney Ad Litem -CCISD Tax Proposed Order Order To Appoint Attorney Ad Litem Order To Appoint Attorney Ad Litem |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Appointment of Attorney Ad Litem-CCISD Tax Motion Motion for Appointment of Attorney Ad Litem Motion for Appointment of Attorney Ad Litem |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation by Posting and Return | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation by Posting Issuance 1 Citation by Posting issued @ $8.00. Sent to S/O 1 Citation by Posting issued @ $8.00. Sent to S/O |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.