Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
College Of The Mainland, Galveston County, Galveston County Water Control & Improvement District # 19, Hitchcock Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, Mark E Ciavaglia, against Lozano, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeves, Kerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: March 02, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: March 29, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: March 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) 12/05/2022 Reset by Court to 11/13/2023 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service - Unexecuted - MARIA LOZANO Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena NOTICE OF CITATION - UNEXECUTED - 21-TX-0138 - MARIA LOZANO NOTICE OF CITATION - UNEXECUTED - 21-TX-0138 - MARIA LOZANO |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge of e citation of e citation |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product 1 citation issued @ $8.00. Emailed to attorney. 1 citation issued @ $8.00. Emailed to attorney. |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Service Tax Service Request 1 citation to be issued. Assigned to MM 1 citation to be issued. Assigned to MM |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition - Tax Original Petition |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition - Tax Original Petition Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.