Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Hitchcock, College Of The Mainland, Galveston County, Hitchcock Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, Mark E Ciavaglia, against Anderson, Fransis, Johnson, Theresa Hobbs, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 212th District Court with Grady, Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrady, Patricia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House212th District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: March 02, 2021Amended Petition
Date: July 19, 2021Tax Notice
Date: May 10, 2021Original Answer
Date: May 06, 2021Tax Notice
Date: May 10, 2021Order - Tax - Signed by Tax Master
Date: May 04, 2021Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Date: May 06, 2021Citation by Posting and Return
Date: March 05, 2021Tax Proposed Order
Date: April 30, 2021Citation by Posting Issuance
Date: March 03, 2021Tax Motion
Date: April 30, 2021Tax Service Request
Date: March 03, 2021Affidavit
Date: March 03, 2021Original Petition - Tax
Date: March 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) 12/08/2022 Reset by Court to 11/16/2023 | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
First Amended Petition Amended Petition First Amended Petition |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Disclosure Under T.R.C.P. 194.4 Tax Notice PLAINTIFFS' PRE-TRIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER T.R.C.P 194.4 PLAINTIFFS' PRE-TRIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER T.R.C.P 194.4 |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRIAL Tax Notice NOTICE OF TRIAL |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer of AAL (Anderson, Fransis) 20210506 Original Answer Answer of AAL Answer of AAL |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem (Judicial Officer: Grady, Patricia ) | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes SIGNED - ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM PG/JF SIGNED - ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM PG/JF |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order - Tax - Signed by Tax Master Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.