Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Hitchcock, College Of The Mainland, Galveston County, Hitchcock Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, Mark E Ciavaglia, against Freeman, Georgia, Freeman, Hattie E., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 212th District Court with Grady, Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrady, Patricia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House212th District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: March 02, 2021Copy of Notice
Date: August 12, 2021Judgment - Tax - Signed by Tax Master
Date: July 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment - Final - Non Jury - OCA (Judicial Officer: Judge, Visiting ) | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes SIGNED - JUDGMENT LB/JF SIGNED - JUDGMENT LB/JF |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement of Evidence (Judicial Officer: Judge, Visiting ) | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes signed statement of evidence vv/ac signed statement of evidence vv/ac |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Tax - Signed by Tax Master Final Final |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order - Tax - Signed by Tax Master Statement of Evidence Statement of Evidence |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Tax Master Report (Judicial Officer: McQuage, Thomas ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.