Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Santa Fe Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Jason L. Bailey, against Sigears, Lance, Sigears, Pamela R., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 122nd District Court with Jones, Jeth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJones, Jeth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 01, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House122nd District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: March 01, 2021Copy of Notice
Date: June 15, 2023Tax Notice
Date: April 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) 12/07/2022 Reset by Court to 11/15/2023 | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Copy of Notice Mailed Notices via USPS FCM Mailed Notices via USPS FCM |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge E-Mail Receipt from Attorney: re:Notification of Order Entry E-Mail Receipt from Attorney: re:Notification of Order Entry |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Copy of Notice E-Mailed Notification of Order Entry To Attorneys E-Mailed Notification of Order Entry To Attorneys |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment - Final - Default - OCA (Judicial Officer: Jones, Jeth ) | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibits -Certification of Delinquent Tax Records Exhibit(s) Certification of Delinquent Tax Records Certification of Delinquent Tax Records |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Known Address | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Non Military | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment - Tax - Signed by Tax Master | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tax Master Report (Judicial Officer: McQuage, Thomas ) Default Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.