Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Hitchcock, College Of The Mainland, Galveston County, Hitchcock Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, Mark E Ciavaglia, against Miller, Angela Marie, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 405th District Court with Robinson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House405th District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: January 13, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: September 26, 2023Receipt Acknowledge
Date: August 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) 12/12/2022 Reset by Court to 11/17/2023 | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge of e citation of e citation |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product 1 citation issued @ $8.00 & emailed to Attorney 1 citation issued @ $8.00 & emailed to Attorney |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tax Service Requesrt Tax Service Request 1 citation to be issued/assigned to sbo 1 citation to be issued/assigned to sbo |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return of Service on Citation-Unexecuted-Angela Marie Miller Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena Unexecuted-Angela Marie Miller Unexecuted-Angela Marie Miller |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Emailed 1 Citaton to Atty. Emailed 1 Citaton to Atty. |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product Issued 1 Citation @ 8.00; Emailed to Atty. Issued 1 Citation @ 8.00; Emailed to Atty. |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF CITATION - Angela Marie Miller (RI) Tax Service Request 1 Citations to be Issued; Assigned to S.D. 1 Citations to be Issued; Assigned to S.D. |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation and Return |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.