Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
College Of The Mainland, Galveston County, Hitchcock Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, Mark E Ciavaglia, against Schaper, Donna Marie, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Lonnie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: January 13, 2021Original Answer
Date: March 02, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: January 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) 12/06/2022 Reset by Court to 12/05/2023 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation and Return | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge of e citation of e citation |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Service Tax Service Request 1 citation to be issued. Assigned to MM 1 citation to be issued. Assigned to MM |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product 1 citation issued @ $8.00. Emailed to attorney 1 citation issued @ $8.00. Emailed to attorney |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition - Tax Original Petition |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition - Tax Original Petition Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.