Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Texas City, College Of The Mainland, Galveston County, Texas City Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Ciavaglia, Mark E, Mark E Ciavaglia, against Citibank, Miller, Laura Marie, Miller, Mark Andrew, The State Of Texas, represented by Jerel W. Ehlert, Ii, Lindsey Elizabeth Mcgray, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 212th District Court with Grady, Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrady, Patricia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryTax Delinquency |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House212th District Court |
Original Petition - Tax
Date: January 11, 2021Returned Mail Undeliverable
Date: August 29, 2022Green Card Returned/Delivered
Date: August 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposition Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable Received From bookkeeping 9/13/22.MM Return To Sender // Attempted - Not Known // Unable To Forward Received From bookkeeping 9/13/22.MM Return To Sender // Attempted - Not Known // Unable To Forward |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Green Card Returned/Delivered | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Correspondence from Clerk of Court #14221 $18,463.15 | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Correspondence from Clerk of Court #14223 $9,366.74 | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Correspondence from Clerk of Court #14222 $27,829.88 | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Order to Release Excess Proceeds (Judicial Officer: Grady, Patricia ) | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Tax - Signed by Tax Master Order Authorizing Disbursement of Excess Proceeds Order Authorizing Disbursement of Excess Proceeds |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judge's Notes on Hearings and Trials Tax Master's Recommendation: Grant Petitions for excess proceeds by all defendants,per order filed. TWM Tax Master's Recommendation: Grant Petitions for excess proceeds by all defendants,per order filed. TWM |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McQuage, Thomas) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.