Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Papapavlou, John, Papapavlou, Mary Phan, filed a(n) Other Civil - Suit To Set Appraisal/Review Of Assessment case represented by Clemetric R Frazier, Frazier, Clemetric R, against Galveston Central Appraisal District, represented by Nicholas Perez, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeves, Kerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil - Suit To Set Appraisal/Review Of Assessment |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
|
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: July 13, 2021Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA
Date: April 18, 2022Correspondence from Attorney
Date: April 19, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: April 14, 2022Motion
Date: April 14, 2022Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: March 15, 2022Correspondence from Court
Date: March 15, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 14, 2022Motion for Continuance
Date: March 14, 2022Certificate
Date: January 26, 2022Designation of Witness
Date: January 20, 2022Docket Control Order
Date: October 05, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 04, 2021Original Answer
Date: August 12, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: August 04, 2021Correspondence from Court
Date: July 29, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: July 17, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: July 17, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: July 13, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: July 13, 2021Notice
Date: July 13, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: July 13, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: July 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Case Disposed CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) Case Disposed 03/21/2022 Reset by Court to 07/11/2022 |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Deadline to Complete Matter Case Disposed CANCELED Deadline to Complete Matter (5:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) Case Disposed DISCOVERY AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DEADLINE PER CONTINUANCE. |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Attorney the parties have settled the case the parties have settled the case |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) Agreed Final Judgment |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED KLN/law. AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED KLN/law. |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
P. Order -Agreed Judgment (Proposed) (1023) (Executed) Proposed Order (unsigned) Proposed Agreed Judgment Proposed Agreed Judgment |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion (Joint) for Entry of Agreed Judgment (1023) Motion (Joint) for Entry of Agreed Judgment Motion Motion (Joint) for Entry of Agreed Judgment |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion for Continuance (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) Reset for 07/11/2022 and 6 week deadline Discovery and Dispositive Motions due 05/23/2022 Reset for 07/11/2022 and 6 week deadline Discovery and Dispositive Motions due 05/23/2022 |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court bench trial has been con't to 07/11/2022@9:00AM bench trial has been con't to 07/11/2022@9:00AM |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes ORDER GRANTING JOINT AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE SIGNED KLN/law. ORDER GRANTING JOINT AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE SIGNED KLN/law. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.