Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Joplin, Cynthia, filed a(n) Other Civil - Cases case represented by Aaron J. Burke, Burke, Aaron J., against Wal-Mart Stores Texas Llc, represented by Clark A. Samuelson, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 122nd District Court with Ellisor, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEllisor, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil - Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
|
Filing Court House122nd District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: July 01, 2021Original Answer
Date: September 01, 2021Jury Demand
Date: September 01, 2021Notice of Removal
Date: September 03, 2021Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: August 24, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: August 13, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: August 10, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: August 09, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: August 10, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: August 09, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: August 09, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: July 01, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: July 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ellisor, John) Case Disposed |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Removal Notice of Removal Notice of Filing Removal |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Answer Original Answer | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Deft's Jury Demand Jury Demand Deft's Jury Demand |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) Set for 09/30/2021 at 9:30 am / Status Conference Set for 09/30/2021 at 9:30 am / Status Conference |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
2230337 Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena Return of Service Return of Service |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Email receipt from Attorney re: Issuance of 1 citation Email receipt from Attorney re: Issuance of 1 citation |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product Issued 1 Citation and emailed to Attorney Issued 1 Citation and emailed to Attorney |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Gabriel Canto's Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance Attorney Gabriel Canto's Notice of Appearance |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Emailed Status Conf. Sheet to Atty. Emailed Status Conf. Sheet to Atty. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.