Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Vasquez, Maria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Daspit, John, Schilter, Stephen, Stephen Schilter, against Berry, Lucinda, Berry, Richard, represented by Michael J. Griffin, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 122nd District Court with Ellisor, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEllisor, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House122nd District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: July 01, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: December 19, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: December 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes JUDGMENT SIGNED JUDGMENT SIGNED |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
P. Order -JUDGMENT Proposed Order (unsigned) JUDGMENT JUDGMENT |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment - Final - All Other Dispositions - OCA (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Deadline to Complete Matter (5:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Jones, Jeth) CLOSING DOCS DUE 11/07/2022 Reset by Court to 12/09/2022 CLOSING DOCS DUE |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ellisor, John) | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) discovery and d c o discovery and d c o |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
P. Order-Docket Control Order - SIGNED Proposed Order (unsigned) Docket Control Order Docket Control Order |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ellisor, John) NEED NEW DCO 09/30/2021 Reset by Court to 12/16/2021 NEED NEW DCO |
|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order-Docket Control Order Proposed Order (unsigned) Proposed Docket Control Order Proposed Docket Control Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.