Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lakeside Lutheran Church, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Moon, John H., Iii, John H. Moon, Iii, against Eco Restoration & Cleaning Services, Family Promise Of Clear Creek, represented by Fred L. Shuchart, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 122nd District Court with Ellisor, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEllisor, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other Real Property - Ownership/Title |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court House122nd District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 17, 2021Order for Non Suit - Final - OCA
Date: January 24, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: January 25, 2022Motion for Non Suit
Date: February 02, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: February 02, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: January 21, 2022Motion
Date: January 21, 2022Order for Non Suit - Partial
Date: January 20, 2022Original Answer
Date: July 21, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: January 21, 2022Motion
Date: January 17, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: January 17, 2022Order
Date: January 20, 2022Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: July 06, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: July 14, 2021Original Answer
Date: September 10, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 18, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: June 18, 2021Verification
Date: June 17, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: June 17, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: June 17, 2021Exhibit(s)
Date: June 17, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 17, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: June 17, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 17, 2021Affidavit in Support
Date: June 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Motion for Non-Suit Motion for Non Suit Plaintiff's Motion for Non-Suit |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NON-SUIT Proposed Order (unsigned) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NON-SUIT |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Non Suit - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NON-SUIT Motion PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NON-SUIT |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
P. Order-PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NON-SUIT Proposed Order (unsigned) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NON-SUIT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NON-SUIT |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Non Suit - Partial (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) as to Eco Restoration & Cleaning Services as to Eco Restoration & Cleaning Services |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) This documents seems to be a duplicate of Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Nonsuit This documents seems to be a duplicate of Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Nonsuit |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes ORDER GRT NON SUIT SIGNED ORDER GRT NON SUIT SIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.