Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hitchcock, Hisbelia, filed a(n) Other Civil - Cases case represented by Sud, Nitin, Nitin Sud, against Norex Engineering, Inc., represented by Daniel F. Castaneda, Castaneda, Daniel F., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Lonnie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil - Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
|
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Copy of Order
Date: June 10, 2021Original Answer
Date: June 10, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice Order (Judicial Officer: Cox, Lonnie ) Order Granting Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Nonsuit Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA Notice of Nonsuit Notice of Nonsuit |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Nonsuit Proposed Order (unsigned) Proposed order for nonsuit Proposed order for nonsuit |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Check Status (4:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Lonnie) jury fee paid and dco filed with dates? jury fee paid and dco filed with dates? |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Lonnie) 09/09/2021 Reset by Court to 10/14/2021 | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
P. Order-Agreed Discovery and Docket Control Order Proposed Order (unsigned) Agreed Discovery and Docket Control Order Agreed Discovery and Docket Control Order |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date (Judicial Officer: Cox, Lonnie ) status conference set on 10/14/2021@9:30AM status conference set on 10/14/2021@9:30AM |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGN-TRANSFER 2021-24044/281 CRT - Harris County, Texas Copy of Order ORDER SUSTAINING AGREED MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE-2021-24044/281 CRT - Harris County, Texas |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer -2021-24044/281 CRT - Harris County, Texas Original Answer DEFT NOREX ENGINEERING, INC.'S ORIGINAL ANSWER-2021-24044/281 CRT - Harris County, Texas |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
9PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION-2021-24044/281 CRT - Harris County, Texas Original Petition - OCA PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION-2021-24044/281 CRT - Harris County, Texas |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.