Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Esco, Corey, filed a(n) Other Civil - Cases case represented by Garza, Josue F., Josue F. Garza, against Cased Hole Well Services, Llc, represented by Michael P. Jones, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 122nd District Court with Ellisor, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEllisor, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil - Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
|
Filing Court House122nd District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 04, 2021Copy of Notice
Date: September 03, 2021Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Copy of Notice Order of Dismissal Order of Dismissal |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes ORDER OF DISMISSAL SIGNED JE/cmu ORDER OF DISMISSAL SIGNED JE/cmu |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion/Joint Stipulation of Dismissal (Esco) Motion Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court Correspondence from Attorney email re: dispute resolved sent from attorney email re: dispute resolved sent from attorney |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Joint Stipulation of Dismissal (Esco) Proposed Order (unsigned) Order Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Order Joint Stipulation of Dismissal |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ellisor, John) Result: Held | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT CASED HOLE WELL SERVICES, LLC S ANSWER, DEFENSES, AND REQUESTS FOR DISCLOSURE Original Answer DEFENDANT CASED HOLE WELL SERVICES, LLC S ANSWER, DEFENSES, AND REQUESTS FOR DISCLOSURE |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit -Return of Service Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena Affidavit -Return of Service |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) status conference 09/02/2021@9:30AM status conference 09/02/2021@9:30AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.