Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Degrasse, Donald D, Donald D Degrasse, against Fults, Kenneth, Healthport P.A., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeves, Kerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 04, 2021Returned Mail Undeliverable
Date: July 27, 2021Copy of Notice
Date: July 19, 2021Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA
Date: July 17, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 16, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 16, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: July 01, 2021Motion for Substituted Service
Date: July 01, 2021Correspondence from Court
Date: June 09, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 04, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: June 04, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 04, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: June 04, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: June 04, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) Case Disposed IN-PERSON ATTENDANCE BY COUNSEL IS MANDATORY. FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION. |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable Returned by US Postal Service / Marked Return to Sender/ Not Deliverable as Addressed/ Unable to Forward Returned by US Postal Service / Marked Return to Sender/ Not Deliverable as Addressed/ Unable to Forward |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Copy of Notice Mailed on 7-19-21 Mailed on 7-19-21 |
|
July 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) | |
July 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE SIGNED KLN/law. ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE SIGNED KLN/law. |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
P. Order-MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE Proposed Order (unsigned) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE Motion to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED RDER FOR SUB SERV Proposed Order (unsigned) ORDER FOR SUB SERV ORDER FOR SUB SERV |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
MTN FOR SUB SERV Motion for Substituted Service MOTION FOR RULE 106 - SUB SERVICE MOTION FOR RULE 106 - SUB SERVICE |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court status conference set on 09/02/2021@9:00AM status conference set on 09/02/2021@9:00AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.