Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pca Acquisitions V, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Work, Glen L., Glen L. Work, against Krepinevich, Grant S, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Lonnie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 03, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: June 03, 2021Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA
Date: August 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Lonnie) Case Disposed |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Cox, Lonnie ) |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes SIGNED AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT//LC/re SIGNED AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT//LC/re |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
P. Order- Agreed Judgment - SIGNED - Krepinevich - 21-CV-0771 Proposed Order (unsigned) Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Final Judgment |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service - Grant S Krepinevich Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Grant S Krepinevich |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Email receipt from Attorney re: 1 citation issuance Email receipt from Attorney re: 1 citation issuance |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product Issued 1 citation and emailed to Attorney Issued 1 citation and emailed to Attorney |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Email receipt from Attorney re: 1 citation issuance |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product Issued 1 citation and emailed to Attorney |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition - OCA Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.