Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Connally, Shawn, Shawn Connally, against $1,522.00 In U.S. Currency, One 2003 Chevrolet Trailblazer, Vin: 1Gnds13S832275582, Davis, Reginald, Hector, Justin Dujaun, Velasquez Meza, Gabriela, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 405th District Court with Robinson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Matters - Seizure And Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House405th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 03, 2021Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: February 09, 2022Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA
Date: May 08, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: February 09, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: February 14, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: February 08, 2022Affidavit
Date: September 26, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: April 07, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: February 04, 2022Default Judgment - Non Final (Interlocutory)
Date: April 06, 2022Citation and Return
Date: June 16, 2021Certificate of Last Known Address
Date: February 04, 2022Request for Hearing
Date: February 04, 2022Citation and Return
Date: June 07, 2021Original Answer
Date: June 18, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: June 03, 2021Motion for Default Judgment
Date: February 04, 2022Request for Civil Service
Date: June 03, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: June 03, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 03, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: June 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA Sent to DA Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jared ) Sent to DA |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes AGREED FINAL JUDGEMENT SIGNED BY JUDGE JSR/as AGREED FINAL JUDGEMENT SIGNED BY JUDGE JSR/as |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes agreed final judgment agreed final judgment |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Judgment Proposed Order (unsigned) Agreed Final Judgment |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) reset per Heather in ADA's office 10/13/2022 Reset by Court to 12/08/2022 reset per Heather in ADA's office |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Support Affidavit- Sendejas Affidavit Supporting Affidavit of Gregory Martin Sendejas Sr. Supporting Affidavit of Gregory Martin Sendejas Sr. |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) 06/09/2022 Reset by Court to 07/21/2022 07/21/2022 Reset by Court to 07/21/2022 | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) 03/10/2022 Reset by Court to 04/28/2022 04/28/2022 Reset by Court to 04/28/2022 | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) awaiting ruling from subm 3-1-22 awaiting ruling from subm 3-1-22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.