Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Perez, Alfredo, Perez, Catarino, Jr., Perez, Jose, Perez, Juan Lorenzo, Perez, Manuel, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Dickson, Kyle L., Kyle L. Dickson, against Higgins, Thomas Jason, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 212th District Court with Grady, Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrady, Patricia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other Real Property - Ownership/Title |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court House212th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 02, 2021Copy of Notice
Date: April 25, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: March 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Granting Summary Judgment - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Grady, Patricia ) | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes SIGNED - ORDER GRANTING NO-EVIDENCE AND TRADITIONAL MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT PG/JF SIGNED - ORDER GRANTING NO-EVIDENCE AND TRADITIONAL MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT PG/JF |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Submission (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officers Griffin, Bret, Grady, Patricia) No-Evidence and Traditional Motion for Final Summary Judgment Result: Held No-Evidence and Traditional Motion for Final Summary Judgment |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Submission on MSJ Notice of Hearing Notice of Submission on MSJ |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plntffs Motion for Summary Jdgmt Motion for Summary Judgment Plntffs No-Evidence & Traditional Motion for Summary Jdgmt Plntffs No-Evidence & Traditional Motion for Summary Jdgmt |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
P. Order -Plntffs No-Evidence & Traditional Motion for Summary Jdgmt Proposed Order (unsigned) Plntffs No-Evidence & Traditional Motion for Summary Jdgmt Plntffs No-Evidence & Traditional Motion for Summary Jdgmt |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Submission-Plntffs No-Evidence & Traditional Motion for Summary Jdgmt Request for Hearing Request for Submission-Plntffs No-Evidence & Traditional Motion for Summary Jdgmt Request for Submission-Plntffs No-Evidence & Traditional Motion for Summary Jdgmt |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Grady, Patricia ) Approving Sale of Real Propoerty Approving Sale of Real Propoerty |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.