Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pca Acquisitions V, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Work, Glen L., Glen L. Work, against Gonzales, Ursula, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 122nd District Court with Ellisor, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEllisor, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House122nd District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: June 01, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: January 25, 2022Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA
Date: January 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
P.Order of Non-Suit Proposed Order (unsigned) NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Gonzales Notice of Non-Suit Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement - Gonzales Notice of Filing Notice of Settlement Notice of Settlement |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ellisor, John) CASE SETTLED. NONSUIT TO BE FILED CASE SETTLED. NONSUIT TO BE FILED |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena RETURN OF SERVICE RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
FIRST AMENDED PETITION Amended Petition. No request nor fee paid for service at this time. Amended Petition Amended Petition. No request nor fee paid for service at this time. |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) status conference 09/02/2021@9:30 AM status conference 09/02/2021@9:30 AM |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Ursula Original Petition - OCA Original Petition |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Email receipt from Attorney re: 1 citation issuance-Attached sent email-email confirmation not received Email receipt from Attorney re: 1 citation issuance-Attached sent email-email confirmation not received |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product Issued 1 citation and emailed to Attorney Issued 1 citation and emailed to Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.