Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Evans, Megan Rynn, Dr., filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Clay T. Grover, Frachtman, Julian, Julian Frachtman, against Clear Creek Independent School District, Morath, Mike, represented by Clay T. Grover, Clayton R. Watkins, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Lonnie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Employment |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: May 27, 2021Judgment - Final - All Other Dispositions - OCA
Date: March 21, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: March 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Final - All Other Dispositions - OCA (Judicial Officer: Cox, Lonnie ) Order Affirming the Commisoner of Education's Decision Order Affirming the Commisoner of Education's Decision |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER OVERTURNING THE COMMISSIONER OF EDUCATION S DECISION Proposed Order (unsigned) ORDER OVERTURNING THE COMMISSIONER OF EDUCATION S DECISION |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER AFFIRMING THE COMMISSIONER OF EDUCATION S DECISION Proposed Order (unsigned) ORDER AFFIRMING THE COMMISSIONER OF EDUCATION S DECISION |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Lonnie) HEARING ON THE MERITS HEARING ON THE MERITS |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF S RESPONSIVE TRIAL BRIEF-Evans Trial Brief Response Response PLAINTIFF S RESPONSIVE TRIAL BRIEF PLAINTIFF S RESPONSIVE TRIAL BRIEF |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOF-Clear Creek ISD's Trial Brief Notice of Filing Clear Creek ISD's Trial Brief Clear Creek ISD's Trial Brief |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOF-Commissioner's Trial Brief Notice of Filing Commissioner of Education's Trial Brief Commissioner of Education's Trial Brief |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Passed CANCELED Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Lonnie) Passed 08/26/2021 Reset by Court to 09/30/2021 09/30/2021 Reset by Court to 10/28/2021 |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement on briefing schedule Rule 11 Agreement Rule 11 Agreement on briefing schedule |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.