Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Smith, Kervin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Disha Roy, Orihuela, Jose Luis, against Bramel, Nicholas, Johnson, Reese, represented by Michael Cancienne, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 212th District Court with Grady, Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrady, Patricia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 13, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House212th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: May 13, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: May 13, 2021Copy of Notice
Date: August 16, 2022Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA
Date: August 16, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: August 15, 2022Certificate
Date: April 20, 2022Correspondence
Date: July 25, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 15, 2022Notice of Intent
Date: March 16, 2022Designation of Lead Counsel
Date: June 15, 2022Motion
Date: October 22, 2021Notice of Intent
Date: December 01, 2021Docket Control Order
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Intent
Date: October 22, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 22, 2021Original Answer
Date: August 16, 2021Order
Date: August 05, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: August 04, 2021Notice of Non Suit - Partial
Date: August 04, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: August 02, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: August 02, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: August 02, 2021Amended Petition
Date: August 02, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: May 14, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: May 14, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: May 13, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: May 13, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: May 13, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: May 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Settled CANCELED Jury Trial (9:05 AM) (Judicial Officer Grady, Patricia) Settled |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference Settled CANCELED Pre-Trial Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Grady, Patricia) Settled |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Grady, Patricia ) | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes SIGNED - ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PG/JF SIGNED - ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PG/JF |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
P. Order Granting Motion to Dismiss with Pre Proposed Order (unsigned) Order Granting Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Order Granting Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Motion to Dismiss Agreed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Successful Mediation Letter 07-25-22 Mediation Correspondence Notice of Successful Mediation / Case Resolution ; Sent to CRT Notice of Successful Mediation / Case Resolution ; Sent to CRT |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Lead Attorney Designation of Lead Counsel As to Disha Roy As to Disha Roy |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification - Kervin Smith - 03-08-22 Certificate Reporter's Certification - Kervin Smith - 03-08-22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.