Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Brown, Arethea, **Confidential**, Xxxxx, Xxxxxx, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Che D. Williamson, J. Luke Dow, Williamson, Che D., against Fritz, Joshua, represented by Allison W. Vann, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeves, Kerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 13, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: May 13, 2021Agreed Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA
Date: November 03, 2022Correspondence from Attorney
Date: December 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Registry Investment Information RE: M.S.B. RE: M.S.B. |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Check Status (6:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) HAS MINOR SETTLEMENT HEARING BEEN SET? 09/02/2022 Reset by Court to 11/04/2022 11/04/2022 Reset by Court to 12/30/2022 Result: Held HAS MINOR SETTLEMENT HEARING BEEN SET? |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Attorney regarding settlement ck regarding settlement ck |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) Sent to BKG Sent to BKG |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minor Settlement (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) IN-PERSON MINOR SETTLEMENT HEARING. (*30 MINUTES SET ASIDE FOR IN-PERSON HEARING.) Result: Held IN-PERSON MINOR SETTLEMENT HEARING. (*30 MINUTES SET ASIDE FOR IN-PERSON HEARING.) |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Attorney attached e mail sent out by attorney to all parties attached e mail sent out by attorney to all parties |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) Minor Settlement hearing 11/3/22 @ 11am Minor Settlement hearing 11/3/22 @ 11am |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Next Friend of Arethea Brown Affidavit Affidavit of Next Friend of Arethea Brown |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Deadline to Complete Matter (6:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) DEADLINE FOR RECEIPT OF CLOSING PAPERWORK FROM COUNSEL. Result: Held DEADLINE FOR RECEIPT OF CLOSING PAPERWORK FROM COUNSEL. |
|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court the court has settled this matter the court has settled this matter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.