Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of La Marque, Texas, filed a(n) Other Civil - Cases case represented by Gregory B Cagle, Robert G. Lee, against Skaggs, Aaron, represented by Gregory B Cagle, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 122nd District Court with Ellisor, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEllisor, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil - Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
|
Filing Court House122nd District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: May 11, 2021Appeal - Bill of Cost from Court of Appeal
Date: May 20, 2022Appeal - Mandate - Dismissing
Date: May 20, 2022Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: May 20, 2022Appeal - Judgment from Court of Appeals
Date: May 19, 2022Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: May 19, 2022Appeal - Opinion
Date: May 19, 2022Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: March 09, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: March 08, 2022Appeal - Clerk Record - File Copy
Date: March 08, 2022Remit Letter for Costs - File Copy
Date: March 04, 2022Remit Letter for Costs - File Copy
Date: March 04, 2022Request for Clerk Record on Appeal
Date: February 23, 2022Correspondence from Court of Appeal
Date: February 09, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: February 08, 2022Order Denying Motion for New Trial
Date: February 08, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: February 08, 2022Appeal - Assignment Letter to the Court of Appeals
Date: February 08, 2022Request for Clerk Record on Appeal
Date: February 07, 2022Notice of Appeal
Date: February 07, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: February 01, 2022Response
Date: February 01, 2022Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: January 05, 2022Motion for New Trial
Date: December 23, 2021Copy of Notice
Date: November 29, 2021Fax Confirmation Sheet
Date: November 24, 2021Order Granting Summary Judgment - Final - OCA
Date: November 23, 2021Reply
Date: November 19, 2021Response
Date: November 15, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: November 15, 2021Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: October 28, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: October 28, 2021Request for Hearing
Date: August 19, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: August 19, 2021Objection
Date: August 19, 2021Docket Control Order
Date: August 18, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: August 11, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 11, 2021Original Answer
Date: May 17, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: May 12, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: May 12, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: May 11, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: May 11, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: May 11, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: May 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Appeal - Bill of Cost from Court of Appeal | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Appeal - Mandate - Dismissing | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court of Appeal Re: Mandate Issued - Letter. Re: Mandate Issued - Letter. |
|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Judgment from Court of Appeals Appeal Dismissed. Appeal Dismissed. |
|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court of Appeal Re: Notice of Opinion Distribution Letter. Re: Notice of Opinion Distribution Letter. |
|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Opinion Appeal Dismissed; Sent to 122nd CRT Queue. Appeal Dismissed; Sent to 122nd CRT Queue. |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court of Appeal Re: Clerkl's Record Filed. Re: Clerkl's Record Filed. |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Email confirmation of Clerk's Record Email confirmation of Clerk's Record |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Appeal - Clerk Record - File Copy Filed with 14th Ct. of Appeals Filed with 14th Ct. of Appeals |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remit Letter for Costs - File Copy Re: Clerk's Record on Appeal ((212.00). Mailed & Emailed to Atty. Re: Clerk's Record on Appeal ((212.00). Mailed & Emailed to Atty. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.