Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Shawn Connally, against One 2011 Infinity Qx80 Gray Suv, Vin: Jn8Az2Nf8B9503426, Perez, Matthew Jared, Viskadurakis, Andrew Johnathan, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Lonnie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 10, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Matters - Seizure And Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: May 10, 2021Copy of Notice
Date: June 29, 2021Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA
Date: September 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA sent to da Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Cox, Lonnie ) sent to da |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes SIGNED- AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT///LC/re SIGNED- AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT///LC/re |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
P. Order-Agreed Final Judgment Proposed Order (unsigned) Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Final Judgment |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Passed CANCELED Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Lonnie) Passed |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable Returned by US Postal Service / Marked Return to Sender/ Insufficient Address /Unable to Forward Returned by US Postal Service / Marked Return to Sender/ Insufficient Address /Unable to Forward |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes SIGNED- ORDER ON STATE'S MTN FOR INTERLOCUTORY DEFAULT JUDGMENT//LC/re SIGNED- ORDER ON STATE'S MTN FOR INTERLOCUTORY DEFAULT JUDGMENT//LC/re |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
State's Motion for Interlocutory Default Judgment Motion for Default Judgment State's Motion for Interlocutory Default Judgment |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
P. Order Granting Interlocutory Default Judgmentp. df Proposed Order (unsigned) Order Granting Interlocutory Default Judgment Order Granting Interlocutory Default Judgment |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Interlocutory Default Judgment (Judicial Officer: Cox, Lonnie ) as to Matthew Jared Perez and Jonathan Andrew Viskadurakis - sent to da as to Matthew Jared Perez and Jonathan Andrew Viskadurakis - sent to da |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.