Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Doan, Nghiem, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jeremiah N. Johns, against Gutierrez, Tomas, United Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Les Pickett, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeves, Kerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 07, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Debt - Commercial/Consumer |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Request for Civil Service
Date: May 07, 2021Copy of Notice
Date: June 29, 2021Order
Date: June 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) Case Disposed IN-PERSON ATTENDANCE BY COUNSEL IS MANDATORY. FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION. |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) of Removal to Federal Court of Removal to Federal Court |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes ORDER CLOSING CASE, AS IT WAS REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT, SIGNED KLN/law. ORDER CLOSING CASE, AS IT WAS REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT, SIGNED KLN/law. |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Removal (State Court) (15003149xA8A8F) Notice of Removal Notice of Filing of Removal Notice of Filing of Removal |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
D-Election of Liability (15001311xA8A8F) Notice of Filing Defendant's Election of Liability Defendant's Election of Liability |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer & JURY DEMAND. (14963965xA8A8F) Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer & JURY DEMAND. Defendant's Original Answer & JURY DEMAND. |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service/Citation-TOMAS GUTIERREZ Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena TOMAS GUTIERREZ TOMAS GUTIERREZ |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
ROS-UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena ROS-UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court status conference set 08/05/2021@9:00AM status conference set 08/05/2021@9:00AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.