Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bank Of The West, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Scott D. Ellis, against Flack, Norman, Flack, Sylvia, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeves, Kerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: March 23, 2021Order
Date: April 09, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: April 06, 2021Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA
Date: April 06, 2021Notice - From Court of Setting Date
Date: April 01, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: March 29, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: March 25, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: March 25, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: March 23, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: March 23, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: March 23, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: March 23, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: March 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) Case Disposed IN-PERSON ATTENDANCE BY COUNSEL IS MANDATORY. FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION. |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) of Nonsuit w/o prejudice of Nonsuit w/o prejudice |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes ORDER OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE SIGNED KLN/law. ORDER OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE SIGNED KLN/law. |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
P. Order of Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice Proposed Order (unsigned) Order of Nonsuit Without Prejudice Order of Nonsuit Without Prejudice |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice Notice of Non Suit - Final - OCA Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) s/c set 06/24/2021@9:00 AM s/c set 06/24/2021@9:00 AM |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena Return of Service on Sylvia Flack Return of Service on Sylvia Flack |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge E-mail confirmation for 2 Citations E-mail confirmation for 2 Citations |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product * Issued 2 citations @ $8.00 each along with status conference. Emailed to attorney / R * Issued 2 citations @ $8.00 each along with status conference. Emailed to attorney / R |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition - OCA Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.