Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Indian Beach Property Owners' Association, Inc. filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sarah Vultaggio Gerdes, against Caeg, Leticia B., in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 212th District Court with Grady, Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrady, Patricia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2021 |
CategoryContract -Application Judicial Order - Expedited Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court House212th District Court |
Application for Home Equity Foreclosure - OCA
Date: March 16, 2021Returned Mail Undeliverable
Date: May 17, 2021Copy of Notice
Date: April 23, 2021Motion
Date: April 23, 2021Order for Non Suit - Final - OCA
Date: April 23, 2021Green Card Returned/Undelivered
Date: April 19, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: April 23, 2021Returned Mail Undeliverable
Date: April 21, 2021Returned Mail Undeliverable
Date: April 19, 2021Green Card Returned/Delivered
Date: March 24, 2021Citation by Certified Mail and Return
Date: March 22, 2021Citation by Certified Mail Issuance - Work Product
Date: March 18, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: March 16, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: March 16, 2021Citation by Certified Mail and Return
Date: March 22, 2021Green Card Returned/Undelivered
Date: April 19, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: March 16, 2021Application for Home Equity Foreclosure - OCA
Date: March 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Passed by Court CANCELED Status Conference (9:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Grady, Patricia) Passed by Court |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable Returned by US Postal Service / Return to Sender/ No Mail Receptacle/ Unable to Forward Returned by US Postal Service / Return to Sender/ No Mail Receptacle/ Unable to Forward |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petitioner s Motion for Non-Suit Motion Petitioner s Motion for Non-Suit |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Non Suit - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Grady, Patricia ) | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit Proposed Order (unsigned) Order for Non-Suit |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes SIGNED - ORDER FOR NON-SUIT PG/JF SIGNED - ORDER FOR NON-SUIT PG/JF |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable Returned by US Postal Service / Marked Return to Sender/ Insufficient Address /Unable to Forward Returned by US Postal Service / Marked Return to Sender/ Insufficient Address /Unable to Forward |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Green Card Returned/Undelivered 92 Return to Sender - Insufficient Address- Unable to Forward 92 Return to Sender - Insufficient Address- Unable to Forward |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable 88 Return to Sender - Insufficient Address - Unable to Forward 88 Return to Sender - Insufficient Address - Unable to Forward |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.