Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Galveston County District Attorney, against Cash, Charles Michael, Lilliman, Gale Dba Gulf Coast Bail Bonds, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 212th District Court with Grady, Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrady, Patricia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Matters - Bond Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House212th District Court |
Cost Bill - Work Product
Date: April 20, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: April 16, 2021Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA
Date: April 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Other CANCELED Status Conference (9:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Grady, Patricia) Other |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cost Bill - Work Product Sent to sheriff by S.C on 04/20/21 - Balance of $248.58 Sent to sheriff by S.C on 04/20/21 - Balance of $248.58 |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
P. Order-Agreed Final Judgment of Bond Forfeiture (Costs and Interest Only) Proposed Order (unsigned) Agreed Final Judgment of Bond Forfeiture (Costs and Interest Only) Agreed Final Judgment of Bond Forfeiture (Costs and Interest Only) |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA sent to bk & da Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Grady, Patricia ) sent to bk & da |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes AGREED FINAL JUDGEMENT OF BOND FORFEITURE SIGNED BY JUDGE PG/as AGREED FINAL JUDGEMENT OF BOND FORFEITURE SIGNED BY JUDGE PG/as |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Delivery Receipt from Surety Delivery Receipt from Surety |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Copy of Notice Emailed 1 notice of Judgment Nisi to Surety Emailed 1 notice of Judgment Nisi to Surety |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Copy of Notice Mailed 1 Notice of Judgment Nisi to Principal Mailed 1 Notice of Judgment Nisi to Principal |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge For e-mail acknowledgement to DA / RG For e-mail acknowledgement to DA / RG |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Sheet E-mailed to DA - / RG E-mailed to DA - / RG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.