Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Galveston County District Attorney, against Bankers Insurance Company, Laird, Jason Neil, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 212th District Court with Grady, Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrady, Patricia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Matters - Bond Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House212th District Court |
Cost Bill - Work Product
Date: March 31, 2021Order to Set Aside B/F With Costs - Final - OCA
Date: March 26, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: March 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Status Conference (9:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Grady, Patricia) Case Disposed |
|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cost Bill - Work Product Sent to Sheriff's Office 3/31/2021 Sent to Sheriff's Office 3/31/2021 |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Set Aside B/F With Costs - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Grady, Patricia ) and Reinstating Bond-sent to da and bk and Reinstating Bond-sent to da and bk |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes SIGNED - AGREED ORDER SETTING ASIDE BOND FORFITURE AND REINSTATING BOND PG/JF SIGNED - AGREED ORDER SETTING ASIDE BOND FORFITURE AND REINSTATING BOND PG/JF |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Email confirmation from Surety-Re: Notice of Judgment Nisi Email confirmation from Surety-Re: Notice of Judgment Nisi |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Copy of Notice Mailed Notice to Principal via FCM 3-12-21 lk Mailed Notice to Principal via FCM 3-12-21 lk |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Copy of Notice Emailed Notice to Surety via Angel Lopez 3-12-21 lk Emailed Notice to Surety via Angel Lopez 3-12-21 lk |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Copy of Notice Mailed Notice to Principal via FCM 3-12-21 lk |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Copy of Notice Emailed Notice to Surety via Angel Lopez 3-12-21 lk |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge For e-mail acknowledgement to DA / RG For e-mail acknowledgement to DA / RG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.