Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Shawn Connally, against $750.00 In U.S. Currency, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 405th District Court with Robinson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Matters - Seizure And Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House405th District Court |
Copy of Notice
Date: June 01, 2021Judgment - Final - Default - OCA
Date: May 26, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: April 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Status Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) Case Disposed |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes Order Granting Final Default Judgment Order Granting Final Default Judgment |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Final - Default - OCA (Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jared ) sent to da sent to da |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Submission (4:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) mtn for default mtn for default |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Return Receipt for Motion for Default Judgment & Notice of Submission Notice of Filing Certified Mail Return Receipt for Motion for Default Judgment & Notice of Submission Certified Mail Return Receipt for Motion for Default Judgment & Notice of Submission |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Submission--21-CV-0321 Notice of Hearing Notice of Submission date Notice of Submission date |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Submission--State's Motion for Default Judgment Request for Hearing Request for Submission date-State's Motion for Default Judgment Request for Submission date-State's Motion for Default Judgment |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
P. Order- Granting Default Judgment Proposed Order (unsigned) Order Granting Default Judgment Order Granting Default Judgment |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Known Address Certificate of Last Known Address |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.