Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Martinez, Yvone A, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Mark A. Weycer, against Fajita Pete'S 5710 Memorial Llc, Fajita Pete'S 5710 Memorial, Llc, Fajita Pete'S-League City, Mora, Pedro "Pete", in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeves, Kerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 05, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Copy of Notice
Date: May 20, 2021Order for Non Suit - Final - OCA
Date: May 20, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: March 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) Case Disposed IN-PERSON ATTENDANCE BY COUNSEL IS MANDATORY. FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION. |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Non Suit - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFT FAJITA PETE'S 5710 MEMORIAL LLC ONLY SIGNED KLN/law. ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFT FAJITA PETE'S 5710 MEMORIAL LLC ONLY SIGNED KLN/law. |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
P. Order_Granting_Non-Suit_with_Prejudice Proposed Order (unsigned) Plaintiff's Motion for Non-Suit with Prejudice Plaintiff's Motion for Non-Suit with Prejudice |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff_s_Motion_for_Non-Suit_with_Prejudice Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Non-Suit with Prejudice Plaintiff's Motion for Non-Suit with Prejudice |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable Return to Sender no such number unable to forward Return to Sender no such number unable to forward |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable Return to sender no such number unable to forward Return to sender no such number unable to forward |
|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Non Suit - Partial (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) as to Pedro "Pete" Mora and Fajita Pete's-League City as to Pedro "Pete" Mora and Fajita Pete's-League City |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.