Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Atlas Copco Compressors Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Andrew J. Sarne, against Plant Process Equipment, Inc., represented by Lee S. Gill, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 56th District Court with Cox, Lonnie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Lonnie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House56th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: March 03, 2021Returned Mail Undeliverable
Date: April 12, 2023Copy of Notice
Date: March 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward |
|
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Check Status Case Disposed CANCELED Check Status (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Lonnie) Case Disposed agreed judgment filed? 03/03/2023 Reset by Court to 03/24/2023 03/24/2023 Reset by Court to 03/31/2023 |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Cox, Lonnie ) | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
P. Order Motion to Dismiss Proposed Order (unsigned) Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Dismiss |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Motion to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Passed CANCELED Motion for Summary Judgment (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Cox, Lonnie) Passed 10/31/2022 Reset by Court to 11/02/2022 |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Hearing - MSJ Notice of Hearing Plaintiff's Atlas Copco Compressor LLC's Amended Notice of Hearing Plaintiff's Atlas Copco Compressor LLC's Amended Notice of Hearing |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date (Judicial Officer: Cox, Lonnie ) notice of setting on pltf's summary judgment reset to 11/02/2022@11:00AM notice of setting on pltf's summary judgment reset to 11/02/2022@11:00AM |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.