Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
De La Garza, Edwardo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Anthony M. Denena, against Trevino, Adam Victor, Trevino, Rosemary, represented by M. Andrew Martinez, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeves, Kerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Agreed Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA
Date: March 23, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: January 28, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: March 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) Case Disposed IN-PERSON ATTENDANCE BY COUNSEL IS MANDATORY. FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION. |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Agreed Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes AGREED FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE SIGNED KLN/law. AGREED FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE SIGNED KLN/law. |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
P. Order of Dismissal with Prejudice DE LA GARZA Proposed Order (unsigned) AGREED ORDR OF DISMISSAL AGREED ORDR OF DISMISSAL |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service -Rosemary Trevino Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena Return of Service - Rosemary Trevino Return of Service - Rosemary Trevino |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - From Court of Setting Date (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) Status Conference Set For 04/15/2021 @ 9:00 am Status Conference Set For 04/15/2021 @ 9:00 am |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge Emailed Status Conf. Sheet to Atty. Emailed Status Conf. Sheet to Atty. |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issuance - Work Product 2 citations issued e-mailed to atty AV. 2 citations issued e-mailed to atty AV. |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Sheet Emailed to Atty. Emailed to Atty. |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt Acknowledge e-mail receipt from atty for 2 citations e-mail receipt from atty for 2 citations |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.