Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jones, Cammiesha, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brett Michael Hill, against Burrell, Erwin Reynard, represented by Jay A. Mckendree, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeves, Kerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Request for Civil Service
Date: January 12, 2021Copy of Notice
Date: May 20, 2022Correspondence from Court
Date: April 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Deadline to Complete Matter Case Disposed CANCELED Deadline to Complete Matter (6:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) Case Disposed DEADLINE FOR RECEIPT OF CLOSING PAPERWORK FROM COUNSEL. |
|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Non Suit - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes ORDER OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE SIGNED KLN/law. ORDER OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE SIGNED KLN/law. |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Nonsuit Motion Motion for Nonsuit |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
P. Order for Nonsuit Proposed Order (unsigned) Order for Nonsuit Order for Nonsuit |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Settled CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) Settled 01/31/2022 Reset by Court to 04/25/2022 |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Court case has settled case has settled |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence from Attorney this case was settled at mediation this case was settled at mediation |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) IN-PERSON ATTENDANCE BY COUNSEL IS MANDATORY. 01/24/2022 Reset by Court to 04/18/2022 Result: Held IN-PERSON ATTENDANCE BY COUNSEL IS MANDATORY. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.