Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Williams, Corintha, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Peraza, Raymer Mujica, Tiffany Pennington, against Harvey, Patricia, represented by Veronica M. Sanders, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 212th District Court with Grady, Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrady, Patricia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House212th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: January 08, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: January 08, 2021Certificate
Date: May 26, 2022Certificate
Date: February 04, 2022Designation of Attorney of Record
Date: April 05, 2022Copy of Notice
Date: May 03, 2022Order Dismissal for Want of Prosecution DWOP - Final - OCA
Date: May 02, 2022Receipt Acknowledge
Date: January 08, 2021Certificate
Date: February 04, 2022Designation of Attorney of Record
Date: October 14, 2021Notice of Intent
Date: August 24, 2021Docket Control Order
Date: April 07, 2021Original Answer
Date: March 09, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: June 07, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: April 06, 2021Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena
Date: January 27, 2021Receipt Acknowledge
Date: January 11, 2021Status Conference Sheet
Date: January 08, 2021Citation Issuance - Work Product
Date: January 11, 2021Request for Civil Service
Date: January 08, 2021Original Petition - OCA
Date: January 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
VIDEO CONFERENCE DEPOSITION OF CORINTHIA WILLIAMS -10/14/21 Certificate VIDEOCONFERENCE DEPOSITION OF CORINTHIA WILLIAMS VIDEOCONFERENCE DEPOSITION OF CORINTHIA WILLIAMS |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Other CANCELED Jury Trial (9:05 AM) (Judicial Officer Grady, Patricia) Other |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal - Final - OCA Order Dismissal for Want of Prosecution DWOP - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Grady, Patricia ) for Plaintiff's attorney failure to appear at Pre-trial for Plaintiff's attorney failure to appear at Pre-trial |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes SIGNED - DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE PG/JF SIGNED - DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE PG/JF |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Grady, Patricia) Result: Failure to Appear - Unexcused | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
134 Design Lead Aty_L VS Williams vs. Harvey-0531889541.1 Designation of Attorney of Record Defendant's Designation of Lead Counsel Defendant's Designation of Lead Counsel |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION REMOTE ORAL VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF ROBERT RAMOS Certificate REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION REMOTE ORAL VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF ROBERT RAMOS REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION REMOTE ORAL VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF ROBERT RAMOS |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Depo Certificate REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION REMOTE ORAL DEPOSITION OF PATRICIA HARVEY REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION REMOTE ORAL DEPOSITION OF PATRICIA HARVEY |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff s Designation of Lead Counsel Designation of Attorney of Record PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.