Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Garcia, Joel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jovani Diaz, against Slaughter, James Thomas, represented by Theresa C. Snodgrass, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 405th District Court with Robinson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2020 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House405th District Court |
Copy of Notice
Date: November 01, 2021Order for Non Suit - Final - OCA
Date: October 27, 2021Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Case Disposed CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) Case Disposed 10/11/2021 Reset by Court to 02/14/2022 |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robinson, Jared) Case Disposed 09/13/2021 Reset by Court to 01/24/2022 |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy of Notice | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Non Suit - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jared ) | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
P. Order for Nonsuit with Prejudice Proposed Order (unsigned) Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Nonsuit with Prejudice Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Nonsuit with Prejudice |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Motion For Non-Suit Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Nonsuit with Prejudice Plaintiff's Motion for Nonsuit with Prejudice |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certificate Oral Interpreted Deposition of Joel Garcia Certificate Reporter's Certificate Oral Interpreted Deposition of Joel Garcia |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
signed Rule 11 Controverting Affs- Garcia Rule 11 Agreement Rule 11 re: Contoverting AFFS Rule 11 re: Contoverting AFFS |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Notice of Service Notice Plaintiff's Notice of Service |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Certificate of Written Discovery to Plaintiff Certificate Defendant's Certificate of Written Discovery to Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.