Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Degrasse, Donald D, Shawn R. Redman, against Harvey, Janet, represented by Christopher M. Thornhill, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 212th District Court with Grady, Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrady, Patricia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2020 |
CategoryContract - Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House212th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: December 22, 2020Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA
Date: March 23, 2021Correspondence
Date: June 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Release Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER-Notice of Appearance Correspondence COVER LETTER-Notice of Appearance |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance OF COUNSEL Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance OF COUNSEL |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Settled CANCELED Status Conference (9:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Grady, Patricia) Settled |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Reset CANCELED Status Conference (9:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Grady, Patricia) Reset |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA 9/13/2023 _Satisfaction of Judgment Filed Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Grady, Patricia ) 9/13/2023 _Satisfaction of Judgment Filed |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes SIGNED - AGREED JUDGMENT PG/JF SIGNED - AGREED JUDGMENT PG/JF |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (unsigned) AGREED JUDGMENT AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement RULE 11 RULE 11 |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- S/C-3.25.21 Notice of Hearing NOH NOH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.