Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Galveston County District Attorney, Shawn Connally, against $30,000.00 In U.S. Currency, Muehlberger, Linda, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 10th District Court with Neves, Kerry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeves, Kerry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2020 |
CategoryCriminal Matters - Seizure And Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House10th District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: December 17, 2020Request for Civil Service
Date: December 18, 2020Cost Bill - Work Product
Date: March 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Case Disposed CANCELED Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neves, Kerry) Case Disposed SEIZURE |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cost Bill - Work Product Re: $373.00 Sent to DA'S office Re: $373.00 Sent to DA'S office |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Copy of Notice Default Jdmt.; Notice for DA sent to Civil DA Queue. Default Jdmt.; Notice for DA sent to Civil DA Queue. |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Default Judgment - Final (Judicial Officer: Neves, Kerry ) | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator's Case Notes ORDER GRANTING FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED KLN/law. ORDER GRANTING FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED KLN/law. |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
P. Order Granting Final Default Judgment Proposed Order (unsigned) Order Granting Final Default Judgment Order Granting Final Default Judgment |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Known Address Certificate of Last Known Address | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
State's Motion for Final Default Judgmentpdf Motion for Default Judgment State's Motion for Final Default Judgment State's Motion for Final Default Judgment |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return of Service Return of Service on Citation/Subpoena Citation Returned Executed - Linda Muehlberger Citation Returned Executed - Linda Muehlberger |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR SERVICE ONLY Request for Civil Service Request for Issuance of Service; Assigned to R.G. Request for Issuance of Service; Assigned to R.G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.