Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Eighteen Seventy Strand Corp, filed a(n) Other Civil - Suit To Set Appraisal/Review Of Assessment case represented by Clemetric R Frazier, Mckenney, Hugh L., against Galveston Central Appraisal District, represented by Anthony P. Brown, in the jurisdiction of Galveston County, TX, . Galveston County, TX Superior Courts 122nd District Court with Ellisor, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEllisor, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2020 |
CategoryOther Civil - Suit To Set Appraisal/Review Of Assessment |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGalveston County, TX |
|
Filing Court House122nd District Court |
Original Petition - OCA
Date: December 17, 2020Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA
Date: October 21, 2022Proposed Order (unsigned)
Date: October 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Other CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jones, Jeth) Other |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference Other CANCELED Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jones, Jeth) Other |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA Agreed Judgment - Final - OCA (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order -Agreed Judgment 1922 Proposed Order (unsigned) Agreed Judgment 1922 Agreed Judgment 1922 |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jnt Mtn for Entry of AJ 1922 Motion Jnt Mtn for Entry of AJ 1922 |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Reset CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ellisor, John) Reset 04/04/2022 Reset by Court to 10/10/2022 |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ellisor, John) 03/28/2022 Reset by Court to 10/03/2022 | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion for Continuance (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) trial rescheduled for jury trial docket 03/27/2023 trial rescheduled for jury trial docket 03/27/2023 |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order (Judicial Officer: Ellisor, John ) agreed and amended discovery and d c o agreed and amended discovery and d c o |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed and Amended DCO and Dondi Standards Proposed Order (unsigned) Agreed and Amended DCO and Dondi Standards |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.