Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
17000 Bissonnet Llc Dba The Keegan At Mission Glen, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Moore, Felicia, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryEvictions |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint document does not contain any violations of statutes. The document includes a summary of charges and payments related to a lease agreement. The charges include an application fee of $50.00, an admin fee of $200.00, a debit card payment...
Citation Return
Date: September 20, 2022Court Notice
Date: September 16, 2022Citation
Date: September 16, 2022Original Petition
Date: September 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ Returnedexecuted | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | PossessionMoore, FeliciaServed11/02/2022 | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
writ - moore Requestfor Writ of Possession |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge Trial (Judicial Officer: Janssen, Gary D. ) | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Bench Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Janssen, Gary D.) Parties Present Result: Judgment | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Bench Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Janssen, Gary D.) | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation ReturnServed | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Eviction Plaintiff Trial Date Notice (Janssen) Court NoticeEmailed to Plaintiff's Agent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.