Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sir Sienna Grand, Llc Dba Hertigae Grand At Sienna Plantation, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Cline, Jarrett, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Gibson, Mark Judgment of $3,624.40Awarded To: SIR SIENNA GRAND, LLC dba HERTIGAE GRAND AT SIENNA PLANTATIONAwarded Against: JARRETT CLINE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGibson, Mark Judgment of $3,624.40Awarded To: SIR SIENNA GRAND, LLC dba HERTIGAE GRAND AT SIENNA PLANTATIONAwarded Against: JARRETT CLINE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryEvictions |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal document related to an apartment lease. The complaint includes information about the parties involved, the lease terms, and the rent amount. The lease is between Heritage Grand at Sienna (Lessor) and Jarrett L Cline (Lessee)...
Writ of Execution
Date: December 06, 2022Citation
Date: October 12, 2022Citation
Date: September 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned
Judge: Gibson, Mark Judgment of $3,624.40Awarded To: SIR SIENNA GRAND, LLC dba HERTIGAE GRAND AT SIENNA PLANTATIONAwarded Against: JARRETT CLINE |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession
Judge: Gibson, Mark Judgment of $3,624.40Awarded To: SIR SIENNA GRAND, LLC dba HERTIGAE GRAND AT SIENNA PLANTATIONAwarded Against: JARRETT CLINE |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
PossessionCLINE, JARRETTServed12/20/2022Response Due03/20/2023Returned02/10/2023
Judge: Gibson, Mark Judgment of $3,624.40Awarded To: SIR SIENNA GRAND, LLC dba HERTIGAE GRAND AT SIENNA PLANTATIONAwarded Against: JARRETT CLINE |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT - CLINE Writ of ExecutionWRIT OF POSSESSION - SIR SIENNA GRAND VS CLINE Judge: Gibson, Mark Judgment of $3,624.40Awarded To: SIR SIENNA GRAND, LLC dba HERTIGAE GRAND AT SIENNA PLANTATIONAwarded Against: JARRETT CLINE |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judge Trial
Judge: Gibson, Mark Judgment of $3,624.40Awarded To: SIR SIENNA GRAND, LLC dba HERTIGAE GRAND AT SIENNA PLANTATIONAwarded Against: JARRETT CLINE |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gibson, Mark)
Judge: Gibson, Mark Judgment of $3,624.40Awarded To: SIR SIENNA GRAND, LLC dba HERTIGAE GRAND AT SIENNA PLANTATIONAwarded Against: JARRETT CLINE |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gibson, Mark) Other Judge: Gibson, Mark Judgment of $3,624.40Awarded To: SIR SIENNA GRAND, LLC dba HERTIGAE GRAND AT SIENNA PLANTATIONAwarded Against: JARRETT CLINE |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation Return
Judge: Gibson, Mark Judgment of $3,624.40Awarded To: SIR SIENNA GRAND, LLC dba HERTIGAE GRAND AT SIENNA PLANTATIONAwarded Against: JARRETT CLINE |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gibson, Mark) Other Judge: Gibson, Mark Judgment of $3,624.40Awarded To: SIR SIENNA GRAND, LLC dba HERTIGAE GRAND AT SIENNA PLANTATIONAwarded Against: JARRETT CLINE |
|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Eviction Citation - Division Program (Covid 19 CDC Order) Citation Judge: Gibson, Mark Judgment of $3,624.40Awarded To: SIR SIENNA GRAND, LLC dba HERTIGAE GRAND AT SIENNA PLANTATIONAwarded Against: JARRETT CLINE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.