Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fletcher, Sharon, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Marrick Armstrong, against Tyree James Denmon Iii, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 4
Date: October 17, 2022Officers Return Index # 3
Date: October 03, 2022Issuance Index # 2
Date: September 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Medical and Billing Records and Affidavits Notice Index # 6 Notice Index # 6Notice of Medical and Billing Records and Affidavits |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Designation of Expert Witnesses No Fee Documents Index # 5 No Fee Documents Index # 5Plaintiff's Designation of Expert Witnesses |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 4 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 4Defendant's Answer |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Officers Return Index # 3 Officers Return Index # 3Citation Return for Tyree James Denmon, III Served 9/29/22 |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation - Tyree James Denmon, III Issuance Index # 2 Issuance Index # 2Citation Issued to Tyree James Denmon, III |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CitationPCT #2Tyree James Denmon IIIServed09/29/2022Returned10/03/2022 | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition for Damages Petition Index # 1 Petition Index # 1Plaintiff's Original Petition for Damages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.