Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Michael A Moss, against Olivas, Sally, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryDebt Contract - Debt Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. against Sally Olivas in Fort Bend County, Texas. The plaintiff seeks monetary relief of $250,000.00 or less, including damages, penalties, costs, expenses, pre-judgment interest, and attorney fees....
Request
Date: October 04, 2022Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other
Date: September 28, 2022Motion for Non Suit
Date: September 21, 2022Motion for Non Suit
Date: September 19, 2022Citation
Date: September 19, 2022Proposed Order
Date: September 19, 2022Original Petition
Date: September 16, 2022Docket Sheet
Date: September 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Olivas - 22-CCV-071561 Requestrequest for copy of signed ns |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Othersigned 09/28/2022 qc/sm/JH | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non-suit Motion for Non Suit |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Non Suit | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
CIT - Citation Personal Service Citation |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Non Suit Proposed Order(stc 9/22/2022 mem) |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | CitationOLIVAS, SALLY Unserved | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION Original PetitionPLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Sheetqc/dl/JH/sm/JH | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.