Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Nguyen, Jackie, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Jason A. Itkin, S Scott West, against Bestview, Bestview International Company, Floor And Decor Outlets Of America, Inc., Inspections Now, Inc., Jason Post Homes, Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Geoffrey S. Binney, Michael I Ramirez, R. Bruce Hurley, William T. Green, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with J. Christian Becerra presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJ. Christian Becerra Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Notice Index # 135
Date: April 26, 2023Notice Index # 134
Date: April 26, 2023Notice Index # 131
Date: April 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff and Intervenor's Notice of Filing Affidavits Concerning Cost & Necessity of Services Perta Notice Index # 135 Notice Index # 135Plaintiff and Intervenor's Notice of Filing Affidavits Concerning Cost & Necessity of Services Pertaining to Colette Ky-Nhi Nguyen |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff and Intervenor's Notice of Filing Affidavits Concerning Cost & Necessity of Services Perta Notice Index # 134 Notice Index # 134Plaintiff and Intervenor's Notice of Filing Affidavits Concerning Cost & Necessity of Services Pertaining to Edison Tai Nguyen |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff and Intervenor's Notice of Filing Affidavits Concerning Cost & Necessity of Services Notice Index # 131 Notice Index # 131Plaintiff and Intervenor's Notice of Filing Affidavits Concerning Cost & Necessity of Services Pertaining to Jackie Nguyen |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff and Intervenor's Notice of Filing Affidavits Concerning Cost & Necessity of Services Pert Notice Index # 133 Notice Index # 133Plaintiff and Intervenor's Notice of Filing Affidavits Concerning Cost & Necessity of Services Pertaining to Olivia Nguyen |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff and Intervenor's Notice of Filing Affidavits Concerning Medical and Business Services Notice Index # 132 Notice Index # 132Plaintiff and Intervenor's Notice of Filing Affidavits Concerning Medical and Business Services Pertaining to Jackie Nguyen |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
01-23-00225-CV_PET MAND FLD_FILECOPY LettersLetter from First Court of Appeals (Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed) |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant Floor and Decor Outlets of America, Inc.'s Notice of Mandamus Proceeding Notice Index # 130 Notice Index # 130Defendant Floor and Decor Outlets of America, Inc.'s Notice of Mandamus Proceeding |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant Floor & Decor Outlets of America Inc.'s Original Answer to David Van Pham and Ma Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 129 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 129Defendant Floor & Decor Outlets of America Inc.'s Original Answer to David Van Pham and Mai Bui's Petition in Intervention |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant Floor & Decor Outlets of America, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Designate Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 128 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 128Defendant Floor & Decor Outlets of America, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Designate Responsible Third Party |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Floor & Decor Outlets of America, Inc.'s Motion to Designate Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 127 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 127Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Floor & Decor Outlets of America, Inc.'s Motion to Designate Responsible Third Party |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.