Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sustaita, Katherine, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by David Aziel Garcia, against Garcia, Joshua, represented by Wade B. Williams, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage Involving Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 14
Date: January 04, 2023Motion (No Fee) Index # 13
Date: December 29, 2022Certificate Index # 12
Date: August 18, 2022Certificate Index # 11
Date: April 19, 2022Certificate Index # 9
Date: February 11, 2022Certificate Index # 10
Date: March 03, 2022Certificate Index # 7
Date: February 10, 2022Certificate Index # 8
Date: February 11, 2022Certificate Index # 6
Date: February 10, 2022Notice Index # 5
Date: January 05, 2022Notice Index # 4
Date: December 27, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 3
Date: October 28, 2021Issuance Index # 2
Date: September 08, 2021Petition Index # 1
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order on Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 14 Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 14Order on Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice |
|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice Motion (No Fee) Index # 13 Motion (No Fee) Index # 13Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Oral Deposition of Katherine Sustaita Taken on May 27, 2022 ($610.00) Certificate Index # 12 Certificate Index # 12Remote Oral Deposition of Katherine Sustaita Taken on May 27, 2022 ($610.00) |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Deposition Transcript Certificate ($408.10) Certificate Index # 11 Certificate Index # 11Deposition Transcript Certificate ($408.10) |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Deposition Transcript Certificate ($188.70) Certificate Index # 10 Certificate Index # 10Deposition Transcript Certificate ($188.70) |
|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Deposition Transcript Certificate ($244.00) Certificate Index # 9 Certificate Index # 9Deposition Transcript Certificate ($244.00) |
|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Deposition Transcript Certificate ($203.50) Certificate Index # 8 Certificate Index # 8Deposition Transcript Certificate ($203.50) |
|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Deposition Transcript Certificate($257.50) Certificate Index # 7 Certificate Index # 7Deposition Transcript Certificate($257.50) |
|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Deposition Transcript Certificate($283.40) Certificate Index # 6 Certificate Index # 6Deposition Transcript Certificate($283.40) |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions Notice Index # 5 Notice Index # 5Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.