Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lidl Us Operations Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Andrea Hoyt, against Fort Bend Central Appraisal District, represented by Tyler Mccarty, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
|
Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 6
Date: December 06, 2021Agreed Judgment Index # 5
Date: December 03, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 4
Date: September 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 6 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 6 |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 7 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 7 |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Judgment Index # 5 Agreed Judgment Index # 5Agreed Final Judgment |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer & Initial Disclosures Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 4 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 4Defendant's Original Answer & Initial Disclosures |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Officers Return Index # 3 Officers Return Index # 3Citation Return for Fort Bend Central Appraisal District Served 9/8/21 |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation - Fort Bend Central Appraisal District Issuance Index # 2 Issuance Index # 2Citation Issued to Fort Bend Central Appraisal District |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition Petition Index # 1 Petition Index # 1Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationPCT. 1Fort Bend Central Appraisal DistrictServed09/08/2021Returned09/09/2021 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Issuance Index # 2Citation Issued to Fort Bend Central Appraisal District | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationPCT. 1Fort Bend Central Appraisal District Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.