Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ctl Propco I Lp, J C Penney Properties Inc., Penney Property Sub Holdings Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Gregory M. Hart, against Fort Bend Central Appraisal District, represented by Tyler Mccarty, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
|
Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 7
Date: March 28, 2022Officers Return Index # 3
Date: September 14, 2021Petition Index # 1
Date: September 07, 2021Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 6
Date: March 28, 2022Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 4
Date: September 29, 2021Issuance Index # 2
Date: September 10, 2021Agreed Judgment Index # 5
Date: March 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 7 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 7 |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 6 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 6 |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Judgment Index # 5 Agreed Judgment Index # 5Agreed Final Judgment |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer & Initial Disclosures Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 4 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 4Defendant's Original Answer & Initial Disclosures |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Officers Return Index # 3 Officers Return Index # 3Citation Return for Fort Bend Central Appraisal District Served on 9/13/21 |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation - Fort Bend Central Appraisal District Issuance Index # 2 Issuance Index # 2Citation Issued to Fort Bend Central Appraisal District |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationPCT #1Fort Bend Central Appraisal DistrictServed09/13/2021Returned09/14/2021 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition Petition Index # 1 Petition Index # 1Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Index # 1Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.