Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sunblossom Corporate Park 10701 Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Clemetric R Frazier, against Fort Bend Central Appraisal District, represented by Sharon Coffee Baxter, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
|
Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 8
Date: February 28, 2022Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 7
Date: February 28, 2022Agreed Judgment Index # 6
Date: February 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 8 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 8 |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 7 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 7 |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Judgment Index # 6 Agreed Judgment Index # 6Agreed Final Judgment |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Return for Fort Bend Central Appraisal District Served 09-20-21 Officers Return Index # 5 Officers Return Index # 5Citation Return for Fort Bend Central Appraisal District Served 09-20-21 |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer & Initial Disclosures Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 4 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 4Defendant's Original Answer & Initial Disclosures |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation - Fort Bend Central Appraisal District Issuance Index # 3 Issuance Index # 3Citation Issued to Fort Bend Central Appraisal District |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationEserviceFort Bend Central Appraisal DistrictServed09/20/2021Returned11/14/2021 | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Process Request Index # 2 Request Index # 2Request for Process |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs' Original Petition Petition Index # 1 Petition Index # 1Plaintiffs' Original Petition |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Index # 1Plaintiffs' Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.