Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Choe, Doyeon, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Alex Boylhart, against Brewer, Rodney, South Texas Enviormental, Llc, St Environmental, Llc, represented by Melissa M Krampota, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage Involving Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Motion (No Fee) Index # 18
Date: April 12, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 17
Date: December 27, 2022Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 19
Date: April 13, 2023Certificate Index # 14
Date: May 06, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 16
Date: November 01, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 12
Date: March 22, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 15
Date: July 05, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 13
Date: April 14, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 10
Date: December 29, 2021No Fee Documents Index # 11
Date: February 01, 2022Amended Filing Index # 9
Date: December 14, 2021No Fee Documents Index # 8
Date: December 10, 2021Amended Filing Index # 7
Date: November 15, 2021Officers Return Index # 5
Date: September 07, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 6
Date: November 12, 2021Issuance Index # 4
Date: September 02, 2021Issuance Index # 3
Date: September 02, 2021Request Index # 2
Date: September 02, 2021Petition Index # 1
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order on Nonsuit Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 19 Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 19Order on Nonsuit |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit Motion (No Fee) Index # 18 Motion (No Fee) Index # 18Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Certificate of Service of Medical and Billing Records' Affidavits No Fee Documents Index # 17 No Fee Documents Index # 17Plaintiff's Certificate of Service of Medical and Billing Records' Affidavits |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Designation of Lead Counsel No Fee Documents Index # 16 No Fee Documents Index # 16Designation of Lead Counsel |
|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement No Fee Documents Index # 15 No Fee Documents Index # 15Rule 11 Agreement |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certificate Oral Deposition of Doyeon Choe March 9, 2022 ($877.20) Certificate Index # 14 Certificate Index # 14Reporter's Certificate Oral Deposition of Doyeon Choe March 9, 2022 ($877.20) |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement No Fee Documents Index # 13 No Fee Documents Index # 13Rule 11 Agreement |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement No Fee Documents Index # 12 No Fee Documents Index # 12Rule 11 Agreement |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery No Fee Documents Index # 11 No Fee Documents Index # 11Certificate of Written Discovery |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery No Fee Documents Index # 10 No Fee Documents Index # 10Certificate of Written Discovery |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.